Global Patent Index - EP 0762534 B1

EP 0762534 B1 2000-11-22 - Method for enlarging the radiation diagram of an antenna array with elements distributed in a volume

Title (en)

Method for enlarging the radiation diagram of an antenna array with elements distributed in a volume

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verbreiterung des Strahlungsdiagramms einer Gruppenantenne mit verteilten Elementen in einem Volumen

Title (fr)

Procédé d'élargissement du faisceau d'une antenne stérique

Publication

EP 0762534 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401829 A

Priority

FR 9510167 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762534A1] The method involves use of an electronic scanning aerial with radiating elements which are distributed inside a volume to be arranged over a reflecting surface. This surface may be plane or a surface of revolution. The width of the beam is widened in a given direction, without causing asymmetric deformations or significantly increasing the secondary lobes. A phase excitation pattern is applied to the radiating elements and an index value is taken for each radiating element according to the expression n= (2 pi/lambda)Pn + 2k pi, where lambda is the wavelength of the radiation emitted or received and Pn is the distance between the radiating element of index n and the point on the outside of the aerial situated on the directional axis on the opposite side from the aimed direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/30; H01Q 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/30 (2006.01); H01Q 21/20 (2006.01); H01Q 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/22 (2013.01); H01Q 3/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762534 A1 19970312; EP 0762534 B1 20001122; DE 69611018 D1 20001228; DE 69611018 T2 20010517; FR 2738397 A1 19970307; FR 2738397 B1 19971205; JP H09107222 A 19970422; US 5767805 A 19980616

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050827

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-12-02 [REG FR AU] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

2005-12-02 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

2005-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050827

2005-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050827

2004-09-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THOMSON-CSF

- Effective date: 20010831

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: THALES

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THALES

2001-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-02-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-01-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611018 20001228

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000119

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970304

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE