Global Patent Index - EP 0762546 B1

EP 0762546 B1 2002-09-25 - Connection box for electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Connection box for electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Anschlussdose für elektrische Geräte

Title (fr)

Boîte de raccordement pour appareillage électrique

Publication

EP 0762546 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113164 A

Priority

DE 29513718 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762546A2] The socket unit Ä1Ü has a flat rectangular main body with a pair of formed hook shaped elements Ä4Ü projecting from the base. The hooks are located into a wall mounted fitting and securely latch the plate into position. Within the socket housing is a block Ä8Ü that has a number of contact bushes Ä12Ü and a spring latch Ä13Ü with a profiled tip Ä7Ü. A plug Ä10Ü connected to an item of equipment has a corresponding number of pins and latches into the socket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24; H01R 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H02G 3/10 (2006.01); H02G 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2491 (2013.01); H01R 24/76 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29513718 U1 19970102; EP 0762546 A2 19970312; EP 0762546 A3 19980211; EP 0762546 B1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070816

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060817

2005-10-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051028

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609718 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980714

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980407

1998-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1997-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIELAND ELECTRIC GMBH

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE