Global Patent Index - EP 0762549 B1

EP 0762549 B1 2000-08-30 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0762549 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113146 A

Priority

DE 19531126 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19531126C1] A metal pressing is formed with a number of contact elements that are separated after production. The individual contact elements 13-16 are joined 10,11 and are attached to the main metal strip 9 which is fed through a press. Each contact has formed holes 6-8 that are used for fixing into the connector housing of insulating material that has halves that are hinged together by a formed thin formed foil section

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/16; H01R 13/405; H01R 13/66; H01R 43/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/16 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01); H01R 13/6633 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531126 C1 19961212; EP 0762549 A2 19970312; EP 0762549 A3 19980617; EP 0762549 B1 20000830; ES 2149409 T3 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070816

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040817

2005-08-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050811

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040816

2003-09-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149409 T3

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605816 20001005

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991117

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-06-17 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 43/16

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT