Global Patent Index - EP 0762681 A3

EP 0762681 A3 2000-01-26 - Method and circuit for changing broadcast programmes during short signal interruptions

Title (en)

Method and circuit for changing broadcast programmes during short signal interruptions

Title (de)

Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zum Programmwechsel bei kurzzeitigem Signalausfall

Title (fr)

Méthode et circuit pour changer de programme pendant les interruptions brèves du signal

Publication

EP 0762681 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96112768 A

Priority

DE 19531527 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762681A2] An EON list of transmission frequencies of radio transmitters and an AF list of alternative transmission frequencies is transmitted with the RDS data. Attempts are made to change to an alternative frequency when the field strength of the received signal falls below a minimum value. After several futile attempts to switch to an alternative frequency, the frequency range of signals indicated to have a minimum field strength is scanned. The frequency of these signals is compared with the frequencies stored in the EON list and when there is a coincidence the transmission frequency is adjusted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01); H04H 20/34 (2008.01); H04H 40/18 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/22 (2013.01); H04H 20/34 (2013.01); H04H 40/18 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01); H04H 2201/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0618693 A1 19941005 - VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]
  • [A] PARNALL S: "FUNCTIONAL OBJECTIVES OF THE ENHANCED OTHER NETWORKS (EON) FEATURE", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL,BE,EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, no. 245, pages 4-10, XP000204758, ISSN: 0251-0936
  • [A] EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION: "SPECIFICATIONS OF THE RADIO DATA SYSTEM RDS FOR VHF/FM SOUND BROADCASTING", B,BRUSSELS, EBU, PAGE(S) COMPLETE86, XP002113285

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531527 A1 19970227; DE 19531527 C2 19990902; AT 252794 T 20031115; EP 0762681 A2 19970312; EP 0762681 A3 20000126; EP 0762681 B1 20031022; ES 2210329 T3 20040701

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160809

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160807

2016-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 252794 T

- Effective date: 20160808

2016-08-31 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160807

2016-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610784

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Free text: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.#PO BOX 5052#TROY, MI 48007 (US) -TRANSFER TO- DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.#PO BOX 5052#TROY, MI 48007 (US)

2007-06-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-10-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Free text: GRUNDIG CAR INTERMEDIA SYSTEM GMBH#BEUTHENER STRASSE 41#90471 NUERNBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.#PO BOX 5052#TROY, MI 48007 (US)

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210329 T3

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610784 P 20031127

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG CAR INTERMEDIA SYSTEM GMBH

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI