Global Patent Index - EP 0762807 B1

EP 0762807 B1 2001-05-16 - Circuit for operating glow discharge lamps

Title (en)

Circuit for operating glow discharge lamps

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Betreiben von Glimm-Leuchtstofflampen

Title (fr)

Circuit pour alimenter des lampes à décharge à lueur

Publication

EP 0762807 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113262 A

Priority

DE 19533323 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0762807A2] The circuit contains a transformer (TR) with a magnetic core, a primary circuit with a primary winding connected to the mains, and a secondary circuit with a secondary winding connected to the lamp (GLL). The magnetic core of the transformer has at least three arms (I,II,III) and two yokes. The primary winding (Wa) is wound on a first arm (I) with a first part (Wb1) of the secondary winding. A second part (Wb2) of the secondary winding is wound onto a second arm (II). At least a third arm (III) of the core has no windings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/232; H01F 38/10; H05B 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/10 (2006.01); H05B 41/232 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/232 (2013.01); H01F 38/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0762807 A2 19970312; EP 0762807 A3 19980415; EP 0762807 B1 20010516; DE 19533323 A1 19970313

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050819

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030819

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-10-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020829

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020813

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606898 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000823

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980505

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL