Global Patent Index - EP 0762852 A4

EP 0762852 A4 2000-03-08 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AMELIORATING AGING PROCESS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AMELIORATING AGING PROCESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBESSERN DES ALTERUNGSPROZESSES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR AMELIORER LE PROCESSUS DE VIEILLISSEMENT

Publication

EP 0762852 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95922099 A

Priority

  • US 9506417 W
  • US 24924494 A
  • US 44089695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9531939A1] A method and apparatus for ameliorating the aging process and the effects of aging and maintaining the integrity of health is provided. The method includes subjecting biological systems to alternating and steady magnetic fields having flux densities ranging from 10<-6> gauss to 10<-20> gauss and frequencies up to 10<14> Hertz. The calculation is made with reference to the equation mc<2> = Bvlq, where m = mass of the target; C = speed of light; B = magnetic flux density; v = inertial velocity of the mass contained in 1; 1 = length of the conductive body of the biological system; and q = unity. The frequency when AC is indicated is calculated with the cyclotron resonance formula: fc = qB/(2 pi m). The apparatus (10) includes a specially constructed pool or tub (20) for generating the specific magnetic flux necessary for treatment. Directional orientation and positioning of the patient (4) is varied depending on the specific treatment scheme.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/52; A61N 2/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/40 (2006.01); A61N 2/00 (2006.01); A61N 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 2/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9531939A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9531939 A1 19951130; AU 2690695 A 19951218; CA 2190136 A1 19951130; CA 2190136 C 20110524; CN 1151685 A 19970611; EP 0762852 A1 19970319; EP 0762852 A4 20000308; JP H10500872 A 19980127; MX 9605799 A 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1014147

2006-04-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060226

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2000-03-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 17/52 A, 7A 61N 2/02 B

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961119

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE