Global Patent Index - EP 0762882 A4

EP 0762882 A4 2002-09-11 - VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

VITRONECTIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

VIBRONECTIN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE LA VIBRONECTINE

Publication

EP 0762882 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95925353 A

Priority

  • US 9508146 W
  • US 26769594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9600574A1] Compounds of formula (I) are disclosed which are inhibitors of the vitronectin receptor, wherein X-X' is NR<1>-CH, NC(O)R<3>-CH, N=C, CR<1>=C, CHR<1>-CH, O-CH or S-CH; R<1> is H, C1-6alkyl or benzyl; R<2> is (CH2)nCO2H; R<3> is H, C1-6alkyl, Ar-C0-6alkyl, Het-C0-6 alkyl, or C3-6cycloalkyl-C0-6alkyl; R<4> is W-U, Y-(CHR<5>)m-U or Z-C(O); R<5> and R<6> are independently chosen from H, C1-6alkyl, Ar-C0-6alkyl;, Het-C0-6alkyl and C3-6cycloalkyl-C0-6alkyl; m is 1 or 2; n is 1 or 2; U is NR<1>C(O), C(O)NR<1>, CH=CH, CC, CH2-CH2, O-CH2, CH2-O or CH2OCONR<1>; W is (a), (b) or (c); R<a> is H, OH, NO2, N(R<6>)2, CON(R<6>)2, CH2N(R<6>)2, or R<6>HN-C(=NH); Y is NH2, NHR<6>, N(R<6>)2, C(O)N(R<6>)2, OH, =N-OR<6>, (d), (e) or (f); Z is (g) or (h); R<d> is H, N(R<1>)2, C1-4alkyl, CON(R<1>)2, OH, OR<1>, or Ar-C0-4alkyl; R<e> is H, C1-4alkyl, 2- or 3-pyridinyl, 1-, 2- or 3-piperidinyl, or 2- or 4-pyrimidinyl; and pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/55; C07D 243/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61K 31/551 (2006.01); A61K 31/554 (2006.01); A61P 3/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 223/16 (2006.01); C07D 235/14 (2006.01); C07D 243/14 (2006.01); C07D 261/14 (2006.01); C07D 281/10 (2006.01); C07D 295/02 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 403/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 223/16 (2013.01); C07D 235/14 (2013.01); C07D 243/14 (2013.01); C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01); C07D 403/14 (2013.01); C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 417/12 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 491/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9518619 A1 19950713 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
  • [PA] WO 9504534 A1 19950216 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
  • [A] SZABO, JANOS ET AL: "Saturated heterocycles. 98. Synthesis and transformations of 4,5-dihydro-1,4- benzothiazepin -3(2H)-one derivatives", CHEM. BER. ( 1986 ), 119(9), 2904-13, XP001087768
  • [A] HOLLYWOOD, FRANK ET AL: "Photolysis of quinolyl and isoquinolyl azides in the presence of methoxid ions. Synthesis of benzodiazepines and pyridoazepines", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1 ( 1982 ), (2), 431-3, XP001088672
  • [A] BUSACCA, CARL A. ET AL: "Synthesis of novel tetrahydrobenzazepinones", TETRAHEDRON LETT. ( 1992 ), 33(2), 165-8, XP001088640
  • [A] SASHIDA, HARUKI ET AL: "Studies on diazepines. XXIX. Syntheses of 3H- and 5H-1,4- benzodiazepines from 3-azidoquinolines", CHEM. PHARM. BULL. ( 1987 ), 35(10), 4110-16, XP001084322
  • See also references of WO 9600574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9600574 A1 19960111; EP 0762882 A1 19970319; EP 0762882 A4 20020911; JP H10504807 A 19980512; ZA 9505391 B 19960209

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961220

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL