Global Patent Index - EP 0762951 B1

EP 0762951 B1 2000-07-05 - TIMBER STRUCTURAL COMPONENT WITH TIMBER LAYERS

Title (en)

TIMBER STRUCTURAL COMPONENT WITH TIMBER LAYERS

Title (de)

HOLZBAUELEMENT MIT HOLZLAGEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION EN BOIS A COUCHES DE BOIS

Publication

EP 0762951 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95912191 A

Priority

  • DE 9408382 U
  • EP 9500769 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: RU2143970C1] FIELD: wood-working industry. SUBSTANCE: wood member consists at least of two layers of wood; at least one layer (10-10f) of wood is made at least of one blank (24,24'), which at least on one side and/or on separate sections is furnished with structure (12,12'). Wood layers (10',10'', 10''') are placed obliquely to one another, the structure, respectively slots (12a, 12b, 12c) of layers (10', 10'', 10'''), preferably pass uniformly obliquely to one another. EFFECT: enhanced coefficients of heat- and sound- insulation of wood member, reduced waste. 11 cl, 14 dwg

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 1/04; E04C 2/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 5/02 (2006.01); E04B 7/22 (2006.01); E04C 2/12 (2006.01); E04C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/22 (2013.01); E04B 5/02 (2013.01); E04C 2/12 (2013.01); E04C 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9408382 U1 19940804; AT 194306 T 20000715; AU 1948095 A 19951218; EP 0762951 A1 19970319; EP 0762951 B1 20000705; RU 2143970 C1 20000110; WO 9532082 A1 19951130

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020302

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EGLE WILHELM

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508541 20000810

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19961218;SI PAYMENT 19961218

2000-07-05 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2000-07-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194306 T 20000715

1997-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970505

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961218

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL SE

1997-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 961218;SI PAYMENT 961218