Global Patent Index - EP 0763159 B1

EP 0763159 B1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR MAKING PAPER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PAPIERHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 0763159 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96910068 A

Priority

  • FR 9600468 W
  • FR 9503823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9630591A1] A novel method for making paper using, within a fibrous composition, a cationic starch having a high fixed nitrogen content, i.e. one higher than 0.95 %, and a polyaluminium compound such as a (basic) polyaluminium chloride or a polyaluminium chlorosulphate. Even under difficult conditions, such as in the case of a waste paper-based fibrous composition or when a large number of circuits are closed, the method enables the starch retention rate and the physical properties of the paper to be improved, and even enables the machine speed to be increased by eliminating an optional paper surface treatment process. Said method is particularly suitable for making writing paper or packaging paper, and especially fluting or lining paper for corrugated cardboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/29; D21H 17/66; D21H 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/66 (2006.01); D21H 23/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/18 (2013.01); D21H 17/29 (2013.01); D21H 17/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9630591 A1 19961003; AT 210220 T 20011215; AU 5338296 A 19961016; BR 9605947 A 19970819; CA 2190499 A1 19961003; DE 69617573 D1 20020117; DE 69617573 T2 20020801; DE 69617573 T3 20050811; EP 0763159 A1 19970319; EP 0763159 B1 20011205; EP 0763159 B2 20041208; ES 2169234 T3 20020701; FR 2732368 A1 19961004; FR 2732368 B1 19970606; JP H10501590 A 19980210; NO 317239 B1 20040927; NO 965024 A 19961126; NO 965024 D0 19961126; NZ 305397 A 19971219; US 5891305 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617573

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140329

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617573

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROQUETTE FRERES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROQUETTE FRERES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-07-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011205

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-03-22 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2004-12-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CERESTAR HOLDING B.V.

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CERESTAR HOLDING B.V.

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169234 T3

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617573 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210220 T 20011215

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961127

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE