Global patent index - EP 0763387 B1

EP 0763387 B1 2000-12-06 - Process for making a protection sheet for a profile member

Title (en)

Process for making a protection sheet for a profile member

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer als Oberflächenschutzschicht auf einem Profilkörper geeigneten Folie

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer une feuille de protection pour un objet profilé

Publication

EP 0763387 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95114616 A

Priority

  • EP 95114616 A
  • JP 33583596 A
  • US 76330696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763387A1] A process is claimed for the prodn. of a film (I) to form a protective surface layer on a profiled object, in which a base film impregnated with a thermosetting impregnating resin (II) is coated with varnish (III). The novelty is that (a) resin (II) is an aq. condensation resin with a volatiles content of about 50 wt.% during coating, and the impregnated film has a volatiles content of 8-20 wt.% before varnishing; (b) varnish (III) is an aq. system based on an OH gp.-contg. acrylic polymer, polyurethane polymer or polyester copolymer contg. a crosslinker which not only crosslinks the binder but also promotes chemical bonding with resin (II) in the film; and (c) film (I) is dried to a final moisture content of 2-20 (pref. 4-10) wt.% before applying it to the profiled substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/36; B05D 7/00; B05D 7/04; D21H 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/24 (2006.01); B05D 1/36 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/04 (2006.01); B32B 5/02 (2006.01); B32B 33/00 (2006.01); C09D 133/08 (2006.01); C09D 167/00 (2006.01); C09D 175/04 (2006.01); D21H 19/24 (2006.01); D21H 27/26 (2006.01); B29K 61/00 (2006.01); B29K 105/08 (2006.01); B29L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/544 (2013.01); D21H 27/26 (2013.01); Y10T 428/239 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31551 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31591 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31786 (2015.04); Y10T 428/3179 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31794 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31866 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763387 A1 19970319; EP 0763387 B1 20001206; AT 197919 T 20001215; DE 59508893 D1 20010111; DK 0763387 T3 20010409; ES 2153870 T3 20010316; JP H10174930 A 19980630; US 6037034 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WERZALIT A.G. + CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050919

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050918

2006-05-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-05-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2004-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040906

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-09-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-04-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153870

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-02-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508893

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-11

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197919

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000516

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970411

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE