Global Patent Index - EP 0763407 B1

EP 0763407 B1 2001-12-19 - Equipment for separating blanks in a machine for cutting sheet elements

Title (en)

Equipment for separating blanks in a machine for cutting sheet elements

Title (de)

Ausstattung zum Trennen von geschnittenem Material bei Schneidemaschinen für Plattenelemente

Title (fr)

Equipement de séparation de poses au sein d'une machine de découpe d'éléments en plaque

Publication

EP 0763407 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96111744 A

Priority

CH 226295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763407A1] The equipment processes blanks having extending around them two longitudinal lateral strips and two transverse front and rear strips being separated from one another by intermediate strips. The equipment comprises a bottom tool in the form of a grid whose bars reproduce the perimeter of the blanks and a top tool comprising pushers each secured above a blank of which it repeats the perimeter but on a slightly smaller scale. Pressers are disposed on the tool above the bars with the interposition of resilient supports so as to urge each intermediate and lateral strip against its companion bar during the separation of the blanks. At least some of the pressers are disposed above the longitudinal intermediate strips and lateral strips are formed with one or more suction orifices connected to a pneumatic negative pressure source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/1863 (2013.01); B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 2007/1881 (2013.01); Y10T 83/2185 (2015.04); Y10T 225/30 (2015.04); Y10T 225/329 (2015.04); Y10T 225/386 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763407 A1 19970319; EP 0763407 B1 20011219; AT 211048 T 20020115; AU 675401 B1 19970130; BR 9603275 A 19980512; CA 2182639 A1 19970205; CA 2182639 C 20000229; CH 690844 A5 20010215; CN 1058208 C 20001108; CN 1151929 A 19970618; DE 69618116 D1 20020131; DE 69618116 T2 20020704; DK 0763407 T3 20020415; ES 2169177 T3 20020701; JP 2866061 B2 19990308; JP H09117893 A 19970506; KR 100206078 B1 19990701; TW 436421 B 20010528; US 5810233 A 19980922

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080723

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080722

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070722

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080722

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080722

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080722

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070723

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070610

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *BOBST

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169177 T3

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618116 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211048 T 20020115

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960722

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL SE