Global Patent Index - EP 0763409 B1

EP 0763409 B1 2000-10-18 - Feed arrangement for bulk material

Title (en)

Feed arrangement for bulk material

Title (de)

Beschickungseinrichtung für Schüttgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le chargement des matières en vrac

Publication

EP 0763409 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110334 A

Priority

DE 19534013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763409A2] The feed device, e.g. for building materials, comprises a chassis (10) carrying a mixing drum (14), a feed aperture (24) in the drum with a tightly closing lid (26) and a feed bucket (40) tipping about a horizontal axis. There is a filling funnel (34), which can be turned to a limited extent about the tipping axis of the feed bucket relative to the chassis and the feed bucket. This funnel has an entry aperture (42) facing the emptying aperture on the bucket side, and an output aperture (44) facing the feed aperture on the drum side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/0841 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763409 A2 19970319; EP 0763409 A3 19970702; EP 0763409 B1 20001018; AT 197012 T 20001115; DE 19534013 A1 19970320

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060627

2005-06-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PUTZMEISTER A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2002-06-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020521

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606016 20001123

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197012 T 20001115

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970729

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

1997-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PUTZMEISTER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI