Global Patent Index - EP 0763426 B1

EP 0763426 B1 2001-04-04 - Method for controlling the inking in a printing machine

Title (en)

Method for controlling the inking in a printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Regeln der Farbgebung beim Drucken mit einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour contrôler l'encrage dans une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0763426 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114355 A

Priority

DE 19533822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763426A2] A method for controlling the colour rendering of printed material (8) produced by a sheet-fed offset printing machine (4) employs a scanning sensor (15) to register the actual colouration obtained. During the run-up phase the regulating mechanisms (5,6,7) for controlling the finished print quality e.g. wetting agent, sheet registration and ink delivery provide sensor signals for computer (13) storage (14) and a complete videoscan of the first printed sheets is also stored. The control settings (5,6,7) are then changed by a defined amount and further scans obtained for comparison to reveal the co-ordinates of all points on the sheets showing maximum response to change so that minimum stored data can control the print-run proper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763426 A2 19970319; EP 0763426 A3 19970702; EP 0763426 B1 20010404; DE 19533822 A1 19970320; US 5802978 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2003-04-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-09-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990322

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960907

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT