Global patent index - EP 0763427 B1

EP 0763427 B1 2000-05-10 - Method for controlling the production of images on a printing plate carrier for a printing machine

Title (en)

Method for controlling the production of images on a printing plate carrier for a printing machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern der Bebilderung eines Druckformträgers für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour contrôler la fabrication d'images sur un support d'une plaque d'impression pour une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0763427 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114356 A

Priority

DE 19533810 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763427A2] The method involves accessing image signals serving for the production of the print form from a memory of a computer and feeding the signals to an arrangement for the illustration. The image data are stored in a first area of the memory (7) which provides the mask to be used after printing. Image data are stored in a further area (8) which provide digital printing control elements used in a number of printing machines (10, 11). After a disposition of a printing order for a certain printing machine, image data of the digital printing control elements is selected, with which the order is optimally performed on the disposed machine. The image data of the digital printing control elements and the image data that represent the mask are compiled in an image data record with the help of the computer (4, 14, 15, 19, 20) and stored in a further area in the memory. The generated image data record is used for the illustration of the print form carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763427 A2 19970319; EP 0763427 A3 19970716; EP 0763427 B1 20000510; EP 0763427 B2 20030903; DE 19533810 A1 19970320; DE 19533810 B4 20060420; US 6029576 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-09-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-04-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990322

1997-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960907

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT