Global Patent Index - EP 0763490 B1

EP 0763490 B1 2001-04-04 - Method for controlling the completeness of a book or a stack of sheets to be bound by glue

Title (en)

Method for controlling the completeness of a book or a stack of sheets to be bound by glue

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Prüfung der Vollständigkeit eines zur Klebebindung bestimmten Buchblockes oder Buches

Title (fr)

Procédé pour contrôler l'état complet d'un livre ou d'un bloc de feuilles destinés à être reliés par collage

Publication

EP 0763490 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810595 A

Priority

CH 258895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763490A1] During the automatic bookbinding process for the production of blocks of adhesively bound pages, the thickness of the block adjacent to the spine is checked by the application of a pair of plates at a controlled pressure, sensing the distance between them electronically and comparing the result with a predetermined reference distance. The block (5) of folded printed pages (6) is carried along the production line (3) on a carrier (4) and glue applied to the lower edge and dried. A measurement station (7) consists of plates (11,12) which are applied to the sides (8) of the block in the glued area at a controlled pressure, a measurement sensor (13) and computer (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/02; B42C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/00 (2006.01); B42C 1/12 (2006.01); B42C 13/00 (2006.01); B42C 19/00 (2006.01); B65H 7/02 (2006.01); G01B 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 19/00 (2013.01); B65H 7/02 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2515/34 (2013.01); B65H 2553/81 (2013.01); Y10S 412/901 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/03
  2. B65H 2515/34 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763490 A1 19970319; EP 0763490 B1 20010404; CH 691253 A5 20010615; DE 59606692 D1 20010510; JP H09156248 A 19970617; US 5876170 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606692

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100909

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100909

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100909

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606692 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970808

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT