Global Patent Index - EP 0763591 B1

EP 0763591 B1 2000-12-13 - Aqueous manual dishwashing composition

Title (en)

Aqueous manual dishwashing composition

Title (de)

Wässrige Handgeschirrspüllmittel

Title (fr)

Produit pour laver la vaiselle à la main

Publication

EP 0763591 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114276 A

Priority

DE 19534369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763591A1] Aq. hand dishwashing detergent contains 40-100 wt.% (w.r.t. the amt. of washing-active substance) of magnesium fatty alcohol ether sulphate of formula R<2>O(CH2CH2O)nSO3Mg. R<1> = 8-18C alkyl or alkenyl; and n = 0.5-1.5. Alkyl- and alkenyl sulphates of formula R<9>O-SO3Z (II) are new. R<9> = 6-22C (pref. 12-18C) alkyl or alkenyl; and Z = an alkali and/or alkaline earth metal, ammonium, alkyl ammonium, alkanol ammonium or glucammonium. Pref. the agents also contain alk(en)yl oligoglucoside surfactants of formula R<2>O-ÄGÜp (II), or betaines of formula R<3>N(R<4>)(R<5>)(CH2)nCOOX (III) or R<6>CO-NH-(CH2)mN(R<4>)(R<5>)(CH2)nCOOX (IV). R<2> = 4-22C alkyl or alkenyl; G = 5-6C sugar gp.; p = 1-10; R<3> = 6-22C alkyl or alkenyl; R<4> = H or 1-4C alkyl; R<5> = 1-4C alkyl; n = 1-6; X = alkali or alkaline earth metal or ammonium; R<6>CO = 6-22C aliphatic acyl with 0 or 1-3 double bonds; and m = 1-3. The agents contain 5-40 wt.% of washing-active substance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/29; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/94; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763591 A1 19970319; EP 0763591 B1 20001213; DE 19534369 A1 19970320; DE 19534369 C2 20000615; ES 2153925 T3 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040907

2005-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040906

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-09-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-04-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-10-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: COGNIS CHEMIE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND II GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2002-12-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021203

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153925 T3

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606206 20010118

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990526

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970318

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL