Global Patent Index - EP 0763613 B1

EP 0763613 B1 2000-05-24 - Device to select and feed weft yarns for a loom

Title (en)

Device to select and feed weft yarns for a loom

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auswählen und Zustellen von Schussfäden für eine Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour sélectionner et présenter des fils de trame pour un métier à tisser

Publication

EP 0763613 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96119033 A

Priority

  • BE 9200987 A
  • EP 93117545 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0598264A1] In a device for selecting weft threads (30) and for feeding them to an insertion member (31) for a loom, provision is made for connecting the feeders (3, 11) directly to eccentric drives (6) which have at least one eccentric path corresponding to the path of the feeders between their position of rest and their feed position, and for providing for each feeder a guide (12) and a means (14) for compensating the transverse movements of the eccentric drive (6) which deviate from the to-and-fro movement of the feeder (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/14 (2006.01); D03D 47/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0598264 A1 19940525; EP 0598264 B1 19971126; BE 1006347 A3 19940726; CN 1034597 C 19970416; CN 1072286 C 20011003; CN 1089916 A 19940727; CN 1158368 A 19970903; DE 59307739 D1 19980108; DE 59310049 D1 20000629; EP 0763613 A2 19970319; EP 0763613 A3 19971001; EP 0763613 B1 20000524; HK 1001594 A1 19980626; HK 1002075 A1 20020315; JP 2004137665 A 20040513; JP 3560994 B2 20040902; JP 3611844 B2 20050119; JP H06192944 A 19940712; US 5400834 A 19950328

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59310049

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PICANOL

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111029

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111029

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111029

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110905

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free text: PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE)

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310049 20000629

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 598264

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971028

1997-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-03-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 598264

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI