Global patent index - EP 0763703 B1

EP 0763703 B1 2000-08-02 - Firing switch for timed multiple-charge launching

Title (en)

Firing switch for timed multiple-charge launching

Title (de)

Zündungskreis für Munitionen mit mehreren Kartuschen

Title (fr)

Circuit de mise à feu pour munitions à cartouches multiples

Publication

EP 0763703 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401950 A

Priority

FR 9510719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763703A1] The firing circuit supplies detonators (R1 to Rn) with a set of row (L1 to Ln) and column (C1 to Cn) switches from an electrical input (B1,B2) to provide a predetermined firing sequence function. Each detonator forms part of a matrix with line and column switches connected across it forming line connection points (l1 to ln) and column connection points (C1 to Cn). Each detonator circuit has diodes (D1 to Dn) connected in series with it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/65

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/65 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/65 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763703 A1 19970319; EP 0763703 B1 20000802; DE 69609577 D1 20000907; DE 69609577 T2 20010419; FR 2738626 A1 19970314; FR 2738626 B1 19971024

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160911

2016-10-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160911

2016-09-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69609577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-10-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BANSARD, JOEL

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALKAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981112

1997-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970805

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE