Global Patent Index - EP 0763748 B1

EP 0763748 B1 2000-12-27 - Magnetoresistive element having large low field magnetoresistance

Title (en)

Magnetoresistive element having large low field magnetoresistance

Title (de)

Magnetoresistives Element mit grossem Magneto-Widerstand bei geringem Feld

Title (fr)

Elément magnéto-résistif avec une grande magnéto-résistance dans un faible champ

Publication

EP 0763748 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306365 A

Priority

  • US 374295 P
  • US 66385196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0763748A2] Magnetoresistive elements according to this invention comprise magnetically soft material (33) in close proximity to the magnetoresistive material (32), exemplarily a perovskite manganite. The combination results in magnetic field "amplification", with large resistance changes attainable at relatively low applied fields. The invention exemplarily is embodied in magnetic sensors, e.g., magnetoresistive read/write heads (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 33/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/09 (2006.01); G11B 5/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 25/00 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); G01R 33/09 (2013.01); G11B 5/3903 (2013.01); G11B 5/3916 (2013.01); G11B 2005/3996 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0763748 A2 19970319; EP 0763748 A3 19980114; EP 0763748 B1 20001227; DE 69611336 D1 20010201; DE 69611336 T2 20010517; US 5767673 A 19980616

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150903

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150903

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69611336

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-21 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RG

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-16 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

- Effective date: 20140410

2013-12-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20131122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611336

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-01

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990624

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB