Global Patent Index - EP 0764272 B1

EP 0764272 B1 2001-01-03 - PTPalpha detection in tumour diagnosis and prognosis

Title (en)

PTPalpha detection in tumour diagnosis and prognosis

Title (de)

PTPalpha-Bestimmung in der Tumordiagnose und -Prognose

Title (fr)

Détection de PTPalpha dans le diagnostic et pronostic de tumeurs

Publication

EP 0764272 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95922516 A

Priority

  • EP 9502166 W
  • GB 9411671 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9534818A1] It has been found that the level of protein tyrosine phosphatase alpha (PTP alpha ) expression is increased in significant numbers of tumors and that PTP alpha can be used as a marker for the diagnosis or prognosis of cancers. Accordingly, the invention provides a method for diagnosis or prognosis of a cancer, which method comprises detection of PTP alpha or PTP alpha nucleic acid. In general, the level of PTP alpha or PTP alpha nucleic acid in a first biological sample derived from tissue suspected of being neoplastic or potentially neoplastic is compared with the level in a second biological sample derived from normal tissue.

[origin: WO9534818A1] It has been found that the level of protein tyrosine phosphatase alpha (PTP alpha ) expression is increased in significant numbers of tumors and that PTP alpha can be used as a marker for the diagnosis or prognosis of cancers. Accordingly, the invention provides a method for diagnosis or prognosis of a cancer, which method comprises detection of PTP alpha or PTP alpha nucleic acid. In general, the level of PTP alpha or PTP alpha nucleic acid in a first biological sample derived from tissue suspected of being neoplastic or potentially neoplastic is compared with the level in a second biological sample derived from normal tissue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/574; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/573

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/57446 (2013.01); Y10S 435/96 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

SCHUH ET AL.: "Obligatory wounding requirement for tumorigenesis in v-jun transgenic mice", NATURE, vol. 346, 23 August 1990 (1990-08-23), pages 756 - 760

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9534818 A1 19951221; AT 198513 T 20010115; AU 2738195 A 19960105; DE 69519796 D1 20010208; DE 69519796 T2 20010419; EP 0764272 A1 19970326; EP 0764272 B1 20010103; GB 9411671 D0 19940803; US 5888746 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060606

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060606

2005-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2001-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519796 20010208

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198513 T 20010115

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TABITI, KARIM, NAT. UNIV. OF SINGAPORE

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PALLEN, CATHERINE J., NAT. UNIV. OF SINGAPORE

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990330

1998-04-15 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: INSTITUTE OF MOLECULAR AND CELL BIOLOGY

1998-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUTE OF MOLECULAR AND CELL BIOLOGY

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961227

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI