Global Patent Index - EP 0764414 B1

EP 0764414 B1 2001-04-04 - A bench with a device for mutually adjusting the back-supports

Title (en)

A bench with a device for mutually adjusting the back-supports

Title (de)

Sitzbank mit einer Vorrichtung zum gegenseitigen Ausrichten der Rückenlehnen

Title (fr)

Un banc d'assise avec un dispositif pour régler mutuellement les dossiers

Publication

EP 0764414 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114697 A

Priority

DE 19535344 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764414A1] The bottom of the seat back is secured at each end by two pairs of screw fasteners, set one pair above the other pair. Each pair has a securing screw (7,10) threaded through the seat back and into the seat support frame (4). The other screw has its head between the seat back and the support frame and acts as the adjusting screw. The adjusting screw is accessed via narrow tooling holes through the bottom of the seat. Metal support plates are positioned between the screw fasteners and the seat back, and provide the flexibility of the seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/40; A47C 1/024; A47C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/024 (2006.01); A47C 7/40 (2006.01); A47C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2013.01); A47C 1/0246 (2013.01); A47C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764414 A1 19970326; EP 0764414 B1 20010404; AT 200198 T 20010415; DE 19535344 C1 19970417; DK 0764414 T3 20010507; ES 2155557 T3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120914

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59606693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120913

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUSCH + CO. GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59606693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59606693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SPARING - ROEHL - HENSELER, DE

- Effective date: 20120419

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010913

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-09-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-09-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155557

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-05-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200198

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUSCH & CO. SITZMOEBELWERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-04-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A BENCH WITH A DEVICE FOR MUTUALLY ADJUSTING THE BACK-SUPPORTS

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT