Global Patent Index - EP 0764486 B1

EP 0764486 B1 2001-05-23 - Process for producing a casting mould for plural brake disks

Title (en)

Process for producing a casting mould for plural brake disks

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Form für den Abguss von mehreren Bremsscheiben

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation d'un moule pour la coulée plusieurs disques de frein

Publication

EP 0764486 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113208 A

Priority

DE 19535457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19535457C1] The mould cast (1) comprises two halves (1a,1b) and is divided in a division plane (X-X). In each of the two mould box halves, the pattern of the disc mould body to be produced is moulded after the introduction of mould sand (5) in the mould box halves with the formation of a corresponding cast hollow space cavity. The hollow spaces, formed in the cast body, are closed by cores set in the mould box. In the mould box (1) are an outer core and an inner core (3). After bringing the mould halves together, the hollow space of the mould is formed and is filled with metal smelt, esp. cast iron, for prodn. of the disc mould body (4). The pattern is moulded only with an inner core.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 25/02; B22C 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/02 (2006.01); B22C 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/28 (2013.01); B22C 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19535457 C1 19960808; EP 0764486 A2 19970326; EP 0764486 A3 19981125; EP 0764486 B1 20010523; ES 2158976 T3 20010916

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030818

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030817

2003-04-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-08-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-08-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158976 T3

2001-08-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A CASTING MOULD FOR PLURAL BRAKE DISKS

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

1997-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1997-06-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970311

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE