Global Patent Index - EP 0764501 B1

EP 0764501 B1 2000-12-06 - Quick clamping frame for a punching tool

Title (en)

Quick clamping frame for a punching tool

Title (de)

Rahmen mit Schnellspanneinrichtung für Stanzwerkzeuge

Title (fr)

Châssis à serrage rapide pour un outil de découpe

Publication

EP 0764501 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96114940 A

Priority

CH 267195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764501A1] The frame has an upper cross-member (10), two side bars and a stop, and incorporates a quick-lock for the cutting tool (3) comprising a thrust bar (50) close to one of the bars or cross-pieces parallel to it, and able to push the tool against the bar or cross-piece. It incorporates springs (80) between the inner face of a bar or cross-piece and the outer surface of the thrust bar to exert a pressure against it, and a retractor. The springs are situated symmetrically on either side of the retractor located in the middle of the bar, and each is fitted into a blind hole (77) in the bar or cross-piece and exerts a pressure against a recess in the rear surface of the thrust bar (50). The retraction mechanism comprises a lug (55) which is fixed to the outer face of the thrust bar (50) and able to slide in a corresponding slot in the crosspiece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2006.01); B25B 5/06 (2006.01); B25B 5/08 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/08 (2013.01); B25B 5/06 (2013.01); B26D 7/2614 (2013.01); B26D 2007/2607 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

CH 652059 A5 19851031 - BOBST SA

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764501 A1 19970326; EP 0764501 B1 20001206; AT 197926 T 20001215; AU 6566596 A 19970508; AU 684432 B2 19971211; BR 9603807 A 19980602; CA 2185642 A1 19970322; CA 2185642 C 20010227; CH 690988 A5 20010330; CN 1065469 C 20010509; CN 1150080 A 19970521; DE 69611135 D1 20010111; DE 69611135 T2 20010607; DK 0764501 T3 20010409; ES 2153527 T3 20010301; JP 2786427 B2 19980813; JP H09131699 A 19970520; KR 100222456 B1 19991001

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150918

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150918

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150918

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69611135

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140919

2015-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140904

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140912

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140917

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197926 T

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-05-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130919

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *BOBST

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120908

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110912

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070918

2006-09-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153527 T3

2001-02-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611135 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197926 T 20001215

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971008

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960918

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL SE