Global Patent Index - EP 0764523 B1

EP 0764523 B1 2002-11-20 - Printing device for indirect printing

Title (en)

Printing device for indirect printing

Title (de)

Druckwerk für indirekten Druck

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression pour l'impression indirecte

Publication

EP 0764523 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114602 A

Priority

DE 19534651 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764523A1] The press consists of a three- or four-cylinder system. The form and transfer cylinder consists of a cylindrical base body and a sleeve which can be fixed on it and changed. There are radially adjustable jaws on the same side of the cylinder to hold it in position, and support elements on the opposite side of the cylinder. The form and transfer cylinder (1-4) is variable in circumference. It can be fitted with sleeves (10-13) of different external dias. All the cylinder are separately driven by motors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/20; B41F 13/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/20 (2013.01); B41F 13/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19534651 A1 19970320; EP 0764523 A1 19970326; EP 0764523 B1 20021120; EP 0764523 B2 20060322

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609877

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110912

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND WEB SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59609877

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110912

2012-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100912

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MANROLAND AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MANROLAND AG#MUEHLHEIMER STRA?E 341#63075 OFFENBACH (DE)

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Free text: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG#POSTFACH 10 12 64#63012 OFFENBACH (DE)

2006-11-10 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-04-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-04-12 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-10-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAQUIN, MICHAEL

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609877 20030102

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAEDLICH, RALF, DR.

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TIEPNER, FRANK

2002-01-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOEHLER, MATTHIAS

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981022

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970915

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI