Global Patent Index - EP 0764526 B1

EP 0764526 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for printing sample cards

Title (en)

Device for printing sample cards

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken von Musterkarten

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression de cartes d'échantillons

Publication

EP 0764526 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810531 A

Priority

CH 254295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764526A2] The device has two side walls (1) and at least one carrier (2) arranged between them for an ink jet printer (5). A paper lifting mechanism (3) arranged beneath the carrier is connected to a paper feed mechanism (4). The paper lifting mechanism is aligned between the side walls so that the topmost pattern card to be printed can be passed from the paper lifting mechanism by an external paper feed mechanism from below, between the paper feed rollers of the computer-controlled printer, which is open to the underneath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/01; B41J 13/00; B41J 13/10; B41J 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/12 (2013.01); B41J 2/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764526 A2 19970326; EP 0764526 A3 19970820; EP 0764526 B1 20000419; DE 59604993 D1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-01-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030814

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604993

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

1999-12-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990209

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980205

1997-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI