Global Patent Index - EP 0764606 B1

EP 0764606 B1 2000-12-20 - Riding saddles

Title (en)

Riding saddles

Title (de)

Reitsattel

Title (fr)

Selle d'équitation

Publication

EP 0764606 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96114194 A

Priority

  • GB 9518051 A
  • GB 9603525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764606A1] A riding saddle comprises, inter alia, two downwardly depending flaps (14) from either side of the seat, which flaps may be altered to provide different configurations so that the saddle may be readily adapted for different riding pursuits. Such adaptability is provided by a generally two-part flap comprising a main part (16) attached to the seat and a plurality of differently contoured removable parts releasably attachable to the main part, either in an aperture thereof, or at a front edge thereof. The invention provides a simple, quick, and relatively low-cost method of adapting a saddle to suit a variety of riding activities, such as show jumping, racing and dressage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/04 (2006.01); B68C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/04 (2013.01); B68C 2001/044 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764606 A1 19970326; EP 0764606 B1 20001220; DE 69611275 D1 20010125; DE 69611275 T2 20010613; GB 2304521 A 19970326; GB 2304521 B 19990324; GB 9603525 D0 19960417

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070904

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611275

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-25

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT NL SE

2000-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001220

1999-12-15 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: BELTON, GEOFFREY PAUL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-12-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BELTON, GEOFFREY PAUL

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981207

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970425

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR IT NL SE