Global Patent Index - EP 0764607 B1

EP 0764607 B1 2000-05-24 - Improvements in or relating to saddles

Title (en)

Improvements in or relating to saddles

Title (de)

Reitsattel

Title (fr)

Selle de cheval

Publication

EP 0764607 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96306807 A

Priority

GB 9519291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764607A1] The present invention relates to improvements in or relating to saddles, particularly for horses. In particular, it relates to a method for improving the fit of a saddle upon the back of a horse. In particular there is described apparatus and a method of improving the conformity with a horse's back of a conventional saddle having a saddle tree and two generally L-shaped pockets or panels constructed within the saddle(s); wherein the method comprises inserting a set of bladders (30,31,32) into each L-shaped panel and inflating the bladders with air or other fluid medium to form a cushion between the two faces of each bladder such that the two faces of the bladder are held apart; characterised in that each set comprises a pommel bladder (31) and a rear bladder (30), wherein corresponding bladders in each set are in sealable fluid communication; the bladders are constructed from a flexible, substantially inelastic material; the dimensions of each bladder, when deflated, exceed the dimensions of the area in the saddle into which they are to be inserted, such that adjacent bladders within each panel overlap; and further characterised in that a resilient element is inserted between the pommel and rear bladders and the under surface of the seat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764607 A1 19970326; EP 0764607 B1 20000524; AT 193275 T 20000615; DE 69608514 D1 20000629; DE 69608514 T2 20010201; DK 0764607 T3 20000814; ES 2146838 T3 20000816; GB 9519291 D0 19951122; GR 3034145 T3 20001130; PT 764607 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160919

2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 193275 T

- Effective date: 20160919

2016-11-02 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160918

2016-10-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160918

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-09-26 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160919

2016-09-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160918

2016-09-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69608514

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH

2015-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130920

2014-10-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140319

2014-03-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140319

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-04-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050405

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040919

2004-09-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040919

2003-09-18 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-16 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030916

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-02 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146838 T3

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R. A. MASPOLI

2000-08-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608514 20000629

2000-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193275 T 20000615

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEMPSELL, DAVID

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WHITE, MARGARET LESLEY

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEMPSELL, DAVID

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHITE, MARGARET LESLEY

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990506

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970903

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE