Global Patent Index - EP 0764730 B1

EP 0764730 B1 2002-11-06 - A method of combing textile fibres and a combing machine for implementing the method

Title (en)

A method of combing textile fibres and a combing machine for implementing the method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Kämmaschine zum Kämmen von Textilfasern

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine de peignage pour peigner les fibres textiles

Publication

EP 0764730 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96114938 A

Priority

IT TO950742 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764730A1] In a rectilinear combing machine, the head (62) of a tuft of fibres is first combed by means of a circular comb (38) whilst the tuft of fibres is held by a nipper (24). A step for extracting fibres and combing the tail of the tuft is then carried out, in the course of which the fibres are taken over by a pair of detaching rollers (58) and are passed through a straight comb (30). A feed stroke carried out simultaneously with the extraction step is brought about by the advance of the detaching rollers (58) in the opposite direction to the direction for detaching the fibres. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764730 A1 19970326; EP 0764730 B1 20021106; DE 69624650 D1 20021212; DE 69624650 T2 20030717; IT 1280468 B1 19980120; IT TO950742 A1 19970320; IT TO950742 D0 19950920

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624650 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMASCO, CARLO

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991006

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970911

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR