Global Patent Index - EP 0764734 B1

EP 0764734 B1 2002-11-06 - A needle arrangement for knitting machine

Title (en)

A needle arrangement for knitting machine

Title (de)

Nadelvorrichtung für Strickmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aiguille pour métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 0764734 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96113981 A

Priority

CN 95221992 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764734A1] Disclosed is a needle arrangement for knitting machine which effectively solves the problem of faulty loop transfer. The needle arrangement includes a cylinder needle (2) which cooperates with a dial needle to form loops and a needle bed having a plurality of axially extended needle walls projected from a periphery thereof. The cylinder needle (2) includes a hook (22), a latch (23) and a transfer-shoulder (21) integrally formed with a stem of the needle (2) below the latch (23). The transfer-shoulder (21) is so formed that it has a curved cross section and an outward and downward inclined top edge. The inclined top edge provides a shoulder clip for the dial needle to extend into. The curved transfer-shoulder (21) establishes an eye (24) of transfer needle between it and the stem of the needle (2) and allows the needle (2) to locate in the needle bed with the projected needle walls of the needle bed received in the eyes of transfer needles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764734 A1 19970326; EP 0764734 B1 20021106; CN 2231265 Y 19960717; DE 69624651 D1 20021212

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-04-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-02-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624651 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991229

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960831

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI