Global patent index - EP 0764745 B1

EP 0764745 B1 2000-06-28 - Assembly-device for vertical, equal, consecutive and U-shaped formwork panels used as light, permanent shuttering

Title (en)

Assembly-device for vertical, equal, consecutive and U-shaped formwork panels used as light, permanent shuttering

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zusammenbau von nacheinanderfolgend gleichförmigen, vertikalen und U-förmigen Schalungselementen, die als leichte, verlorene Schalung verwendet werden

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage de banches en U verticaux égaux consécutifs utilisé en coffrages perdus légers

Publication

EP 0764745 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420295 A

Priority

FR 9511179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764745A1] The assembly component consists of a vertical U-shaped member with sliders (a) on the outer surfaces of its arms which lie perpendicular to the plane of the U and engage with shuttering panels which can be made from any suitable construction materials, either insulating or not. The inward-facing surfaces of the shuttering panels have vertical channels to receive the sliders (a), so that the U-shaped members ensure an even gap between the panels which can be filled with concrete to make a continuously-cast wall. The panels are rectangular in shape and of an appropriate thickness, and their upper and lower edges are joined together by horizontal connecting pieces to create a shuttering assembly of the required size.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2013.01); E04B 2/8641 (2013.01); E04B 2002/867 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764745 A1 19970326; EP 0764745 B1 20000628; AT 194194 T 20000715; DE 69609027 D1 20000803; DE 69609027 T2 20010322; FR 2738856 A1 19970321; FR 2738856 B1 19971031

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BENARROUCH JACQUES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VIANNAY-QUIDEAU MARINE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609027

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194194

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990315

1997-07-16 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19970328

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970408

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT SE