Global Patent Index - EP 0764749 B1

EP 0764749 B1 2001-03-28 - Support assembly of a cantilevered element vis à vis the vertical façade of a curtain wall of a building or similar construction

Title (en)

Support assembly of a cantilevered element vis à vis the vertical façade of a curtain wall of a building or similar construction

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für ein, gegenüber der vertikalen Fassade einer Vorhängewand eines Gebäudes oder ähnlichen Konstruktion, freitragendes Element

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support d'un élément en porte à faux vis-à-vis de la façade verticale d'un mur rideau d'un batiment ou construction analogue

Publication

EP 0764749 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401797 A

Priority

FR 9510984 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764749A1] The bracket for a window shade frame on the outside of a glass curtain-walled building, consists of a T-shaped plate (20) with a flat base (21) to fix onto a vertical support (4) of the building frame, and a central tongue (23) set perpendicular to the base and made with at least one aperture (24) for a pivot (26) to which the frame (11) is attached. The frame connects with the projecting tongue of the bracket by a forked end (25) fitting on either side of the tongue and has apertures in both sides for the pivot. The bracket also has a seal (31) between the base and an outer pressure strip (17), and it is connected to the frame upright by screws (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/08; E04F 13/08; E06B 7/082

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E06B 7/082 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2013.01); E04F 10/08 (2013.01); E04F 13/0814 (2013.01); E06B 7/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764749 A1 19970326; EP 0764749 B1 20010328; DE 69612251 D1 20010503; DE 69612251 T2 20010809; ES 2155177 T3 20010501; FR 2738857 A1 19970321; FR 2738857 B1 19971121; GR 3035648 T3 20010629; PT 764749 E 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050819

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030820

2004-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030819

2004-03-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TECHNAL

- Effective date: 20030831

2004-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-08-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-08-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020822

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020807

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-03 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612251 20010503

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155177 T3

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991026

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNAL

1999-09-15 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 19990628 0100 TECHNAL LIMITED, SOCIETE ANONYME DE DROIT BRITANNIQUE

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970310

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT