Global patent index - EP 0764783 B1

EP 0764783 B1 2001-02-28 - Moineau pump

Title (en)

Moineau pump

Title (de)

Exzenterschneckenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe Moineau

Publication

EP 0764783 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96113275 A

Priority

DE 19534774 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764783A1] The pump rotor (3) is made of rigid material and is driven by an electric motor. To reduce the motor starting current, the lining (5) is prestressed at 5 to 15% against the rotor. The lining surface (8) bearing against the rotor contains a fine structure between protrusions (15), so as to accommodate liquid or pasty ingredients in the medium handled. The protrusions can be formed by rounded bosses, and the structure can resemble flakes nesting together. The protrusions can be in rows one behind the other, those in adjacent rows being offset for half the intervals between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/1075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19534774 A1 19970320; AT 199437 T 20010315; EP 0764783 A1 19970326; EP 0764783 B1 20010228; ES 2156242 T3 20010616

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20020902

2003-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-01-22 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: WEINGAERTNER MASCHINENBAU GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WEINGAERTNER MASCHINENBAU GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-10-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010822

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156242

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199437

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991027

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970128

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL