Global Patent Index - EP 0764811 B1

EP 0764811 B1 2002-11-06 - Vehicle lighting or signalling device comprising improved ventilation means

Title (en)

Vehicle lighting or signalling device comprising improved ventilation means

Title (de)

Fahrzeug-Beleuchtungs- oder Signaleinrichtung mit verbesserten Ventilationsmitteln

Title (fr)

Appareil d'éclairage ou de signalisation de véhicule pourvu de moyens de ventilation perfectionnés

Publication

EP 0764811 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401994 A

Priority

FR 9510957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764811A1] The lighting or signalling unit comprises a box (100) and a cover (200) mounted on the box. The combination of the box and the cover defines a serpentine ventilation passage leading through the internal cavity in which the bulb is mounted. This serpentine passage includes a double air input at the bottom of the structure, consisting of two input apertures (216b) leading into an inlet passage (T1) which extends transversely. The two parts of the housing then define a chicane (T1,T2,T3) extending towards the top. The final section of the chicane communicates with the internal space by means of apertures which are formed with the elastic mounting terminals (210b) by which the cover is attached to the box.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 31/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 31/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/335 (2013.01); F21S 48/337 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764811 A1 19970326; EP 0764811 B1 20021106; DE 69624653 D1 20021212; DE 69624653 T2 20030821; ES 2186764 T3 20030516; FR 2738782 A1 19970321; FR 2738782 B1 19971205; JP 3804116 B2 20060802; JP H09167507 A 19970624; US 5758957 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160920

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160918

2016-10-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160918

2016-09-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69624653

2016-03-10 [REG ES GD2A] CONTRACTUAL LICENCES

- Effective date: 20160310

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-02-01 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20041229

2003-08-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186764 T3

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624653 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 31/03 A

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970915

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT