Global Patent Index - EP 0764819 B1

EP 0764819 B1 2000-03-29 - Improved air flow control device

Title (en)

Improved air flow control device

Title (de)

Verbesserte Luftströmungsregler-Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif régulateur de débit d'air perfectionné

Publication

EP 0764819 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401983 A

Priority

FR 9511047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764819A1] The regulator consists of a single shutter (5) with a spring (9), pivoted to the forward end of a housing (1) to form a duct (2) with a section which varies with the air pressure to maintain a constant flow rate. The shutter interacts with the duct housing so that the channel through which the air flows converges in the direction of the flow for all shutter positions. The shutter extends beyond the minimal section of the canal, and the housing has a wall which faces the shutter and is inclined towards the axis of the canal from front to rear. The wall (7) can be made adjustable to vary the air flow through the duct, and the channel (8) can be made with an axis which is inclined relative to that of the housing. During operation the position of the shutter varies with the force of the aid flow through an aperture (10) beneath it, maintaining the flow through the duct at a constant rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764819 A1 19970326; EP 0764819 B1 20000329; DE 69607428 D1 20000504; DE 69607428 T2 20001019; FR 2738901 A1 19970321; FR 2738901 B1 19971121

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2003-05-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VIM

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-11-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011001

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-09-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: VIM SASU

2001-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ABB VIM SOCIETE EN NOM COLLECTIF

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607428 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981217

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970108

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT NL