Global Patent Index - EP 0764927 B1

EP 0764927 B1 2002-09-04 - Video surveillance system

Title (en)

Video surveillance system

Title (de)

Video-Überwachungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de vidéo surveillance

Publication

EP 0764927 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96402009 A

Priority

FR 9511157 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764927A1] The Surveillance System has TV cameras monitoring the spectator area, with each camera covering a specific stadium area. A command post monitors the camera images. Each camera has a receiver (15A) and a processing unit (13). When a crowd event is detected by the processing unit, an alarm is set at the control post, and individual cameras in the vicinity are set (25) to monitor the event, with focussing and zoom set appropriately. The video pictures are also recorded for future reference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19695 (2013.01); G08B 13/19641 (2013.01); G08B 13/19689 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764927 A1 19970326; EP 0764927 B1 20020904; DE 69623403 D1 20021010; DE 69623403 T2 20030417; ES 2180717 T3 20030216; FR 2739207 A1 19970328; FR 2739207 B1 19971219

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060925

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: C.P. *SYNERGIE

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060925

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060923

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060923

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: C.P. *SYNERGIE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-10-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031015

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180717 T3

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623403 20021010

2002-09-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: C.P. *SYNERGIE4 BIS ALLUE CHARLES V, F-94300 VINCE

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000821

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-07-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL