Global Patent Index - EP 0764959 A3

EP 0764959 A3 2000-03-15 - Impact sensor for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Impact sensor for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Aufprallsensor für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Capteur de choc pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0764959 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96830392 A

Priority

IT MI950639 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0764959A2] An impact sensor for motor vehicles comprises an inertial mass, housed in a seat, and defining a stable not actuated position and an actuated position for an electric contact, the housing seat being of conical configuration and the inertial mass being held in a non actuated stable position by a cup spring. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0764959 A2 19970326; EP 0764959 A3 20000315; IT 237159 Y1 20000831; IT MI950639 U1 19970320; IT MI950639 V0 19950920

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT