Global patent index - EP 0765003 B1

EP 0765003 B1 2000-05-24 - Electric contact

Title (en)

Electric contact

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kontakt

Title (fr)

Contact électrique

Publication

EP 0765003 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114540 A

Priority

DE 19535148 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765003A1] The part is stamped out of sheet metal and folded so that the box has four sidewalls (2-5), with a seam (6) in one wall (2) where the opposite edges (7,8) come together. The shapes of these edges are complementary in that two projections (9,10) from one edge (8) fit precisely into corresponding notches (11,12) in the other edge (7). Between the notches a hemispherical recess (15) prevents sliding of either part of the sidewall over or under the other part when lateral force is exerted. Additional fixing of the edges to the seam is ensured by spot welds (17,18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0765003 A1 19970326; EP 0765003 B1 20000524; DE 19535148 A1 19970327; US 5716244 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2006-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-09-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605286

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

1999-09-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ELECTRIC CONTACT

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990615

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970821

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT