Global Patent Index - EP 0765212 B1

EP 0765212 B1 2000-05-03 - DEVICE FOR PRESSURE CASTING MELTABLE SYNTHETIC MATERIALS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRESSURE CASTING MELTABLE SYNTHETIC MATERIALS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM DRUCKVERGIESSEN VON AUFSCHMELZBAREN KUNSTSTOFFMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE SOUS PRESSION DE MATERIAUX SYNTHETIQUES FUSIBLES

Publication

EP 0765212 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904763 A

Priority

  • DE 19511062 A
  • EP 9600603 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19511062A1] A device for pressure casting meltable synthetic materials, especially high melting point casting substances, with a divided mould and an injection point outside the parting plane of the mould, in which the mould is arranged in a workbench plane with a working area for the operative, is to be easy to handle, provide a high standard of safety against burns through the uncontrolled emergence of hot melt, permit the establishment of a multi-position working area and ensure that the molten material has the shortest possible path to the processing point. This is attained in that the mould (4/5) has a lower section (4) in the workbench plane (3) with an injection channel (17) with injection point (25) substantially perpendicular to the workbench plane and an upper mould section (5) which can be pivoted upwards and downwards and in that the workbench (2) has a tank melting installation (11, 12, 21) with a pressuretight premelting tank (11) and a main melting region (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/46; B29C 45/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/03 (2006.01); B29C 45/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/46 (2013.01); B29C 45/03 (2013.01); B29C 2045/465 (2013.01); B29K 2105/0097 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19511062 A1 19960926; AT 192380 T 20000515; AU 4875496 A 19961016; CZ 9602530 A3 19970115; DE 19680174 C1 19980716; DE 19680174 D2 19971127; EP 0765212 A1 19970402; EP 0765212 B1 20000503; HU 9603242 A2 19970528; HU 9603242 A3 19990830; PL 317224 A1 19970317; WO 9630187 A1 19961003

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605113 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR IT

2000-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192380 T 20000515

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981028

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970208

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR IT