Global Patent Index - EP 0765288 B1

EP 0765288 B1 2000-02-02 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A STREAM OF PRINT SHOP PRODUCTS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONVEYING A STREAM OF PRINT SHOP PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN EINES STROMS VON DRUCKEREIERZEUGNISSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSPORTER UN FLUX DE PRODUITS D'IMPRIMERIE

Publication

EP 0765288 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96907238 A

Priority

  • CH 9600120 W
  • CH 106195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632351A1] The invention relates to a process and a device for conveying a stream of print shop products in which the products are initially conveyed along a first conveyor loop in a position substantially tangential to the conveying direction and transferred to a second conveyor loop. To facilitate the transfer the print shop products are taken to a transfer point at which at least a part of each product is at an angle to the tangential position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/00; B65H 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/005 (2013.01); B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44712 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44732 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/44712 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2301/44732 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632351 A1 19961017; DE 59604360 D1 20000309; EP 0765288 A1 19970402; EP 0765288 B1 20000202; JP 3793232 B2 20060705; JP H10501511 A 19980210; US 5957449 A 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160402

2016-04-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160402

2016-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604360

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ZANELLA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604360 20000309

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980904

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961209

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI