Global Patent Index - EP 0765374 B1

EP 0765374 B1 2001-12-05 - GREASE COMPOSITION

Title (en)

GREASE COMPOSITION

Title (de)

SCHMIERFETTZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE GRAISSE

Publication

EP 0765374 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95923825 A

Priority

  • US 9507471 W
  • US 26149194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9535355A1] A lubricating grease having improved noise properties and high dropping point. The grease comprises a base oil, from 2 to 30 wt.% of a lithium soap complex thickener and from 0.1 to 10 wt.% of a polyalkenyl succinic anhydride, polyisobutenyl succinic acid or mixture thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/06 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 20/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/06 (2013.01); C10M 117/02 (2013.01); C10M 117/04 (2013.01); C10M 117/06 (2013.01); C10M 117/08 (2013.01); C10M 119/30 (2013.01); C10M 129/93 (2013.01); C10M 129/95 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1225 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1245 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1265 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/141 (2013.01); C10M 2207/1415 (2013.01); C10M 2207/144 (2013.01); C10M 2207/146 (2013.01); C10M 2207/166 (2013.01); C10M 2207/186 (2013.01); C10M 2207/206 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/246 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9535355 A1 19951228; CA 2191481 A1 19951228; CA 2191481 C 20050607; DE 69524412 D1 20020117; DE 69524412 T2 20020502; EP 0765374 A1 19970402; EP 0765374 B1 20011205; JP 3762432 B2 20060405; JP H10501844 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090612

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CY

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524412 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971112

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970115

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL