Global Patent Index - EP 0765558 B1

EP 0765558 B1 2001-02-28 - A PACKET DATA COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (en)

A PACKET DATA COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (de)

PAKETDATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES PAR PAQUETS

Publication

EP 0765558 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95932596 A

Priority

  • CA 9500558 W
  • US 42120895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5537395A] A method of setting a channel congestion message in a wireless multiple access packet data system in which the channel congestion message is broadcast on the forward channel of the system and communication over the reverse channel is in the form of bursts. The method comprises the steps of: measuring an actual fraction of undecodable bursts on the reverse channel; measuring traffic parameters of the reverse channel; predicting from the measured traffic parameters an expected fraction of undecodable bursts for optimum throughput on the reverse channel; comparing the actual and expected fractions of undecodable bursts, and; setting the congestion message according to the result of the comparison. A system for implementing the method is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/56; H04Q 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04W 28/12 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 28/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5537395 A 19960716; CA 2185357 A1 19961017; CA 2185357 C 20010904; DE 69520213 D1 20010405; DE 69520213 T2 20010613; EP 0765558 A1 19970402; EP 0765558 B1 20010228; JP H10501677 A 19980210; WO 9632794 A1 19961017

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041005

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041005

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031003

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030915

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520213 20010405

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990602

1999-07-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961122

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB