Global patent index - EP 0765604 B1

EP 0765604 B1 2000-11-08 - Process and apparatus for flavouring tea and similar products

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for flavouring tea and similar products

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aromatisieren von Tee und teeähnlichen Erzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour aromatiser du thé et des produits analogues au thé

Publication

EP 0765604 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95115219 A

Priority

EP 95115219 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765604A1] Process for combining dry tea leaves (25), or a tea-like substance, with an added aromatic ingredient (8, 23). The added aromatic substance is pref. a dry granulated product taken from a hopper feed and placed in small discrete doses on a moving belt made of tea bag filter paper, with pre-determined doses of dry tea leaf (25). The belt and contents are subsequently folded, cut and sealed into tea bags. In the process, (a) the aromatic ingredient (8, 23) is placed in small discrete heaps on the filter paper belt (1); and (b) the small piles of dry tea leaf (25) are placed on the belt (1) on or adjacent to the aromatic ingredient piles (8, 23), and (c) the combined individual portions of aromatic additive and dry tea are then wrapped in the filter paper (1) as a tea bag. Also claimed is an appts. for the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23F 3/40; B65B 1/36; B65B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23F 3/40 (2006.01); B65B 1/36 (2006.01); B65B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 29/02 (2013.01); A23F 3/40 (2013.01); B65B 1/366 (2013.01); B65D 81/3261 (2013.01); B65D 85/808 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0765604 A1 19970402; EP 0765604 B1 20001108; AT 197375 T 20001111; DE 59508846 D1 20001214; ES 2152356 T3 20010201; JP H09118310 A 19970506; US 5927052 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status

2015-09-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508846

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141007

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040928

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040927

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-09-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040927

2004-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040927

2003-10-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152356

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-01-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508846

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-14

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197375

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIPPES, HELMUT

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KLEIN, MICHAEL

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990623

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960315

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;SI