Global Patent Index - EP 0765693 B1

EP 0765693 B1 2000-12-27 - Paint roller with limited application pressure

Title (en)

Paint roller with limited application pressure

Title (de)

Farbroller mit Andruckbegrenzung

Title (fr)

Rouleau à peindre avec limitation de la pression d'application

Publication

EP 0765693 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96112779 A

Priority

DE 19531385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765693A1] The annular flanges (13) are rigidly attached to the face end of the roller (3) and protrude beyond the its external diameter. The annular flange is especially formed on the face end sealing components (6) connected to the roller. The annular flange may be formed by a sealing cover (7). This is detachably fitted on the face ends of the roller and is preferably clamped to it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/0247 (2013.01); B05C 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19531385 A1 19970227; DE 19531385 C2 19990408; AT 198284 T 20010115; DK 0765693 T3 20010129; EP 0765693 A1 19970402; EP 0765693 B1 20001227; ES 2153065 T3 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-04-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021123

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020808

2003-04-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-09-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-08-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-08-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TECHNO-WERKZEUG A.E. VERTRIEBS GMBH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHNO-WERKZEUG A.E. VERTRIEBS GMBH

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-08-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010827

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010720

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153065 T3

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606250 20010201

2001-01-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-12-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198284 T 20010115

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990610

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970407

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE