Global Patent Index - EP 0765697 B1

EP 0765697 B1 2000-03-15 - Device for in-situ precision grinding of the rolls of hot strip mills

Title (en)

Device for in-situ precision grinding of the rolls of hot strip mills

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Nachschleifen der in Warmbandwalzgerüsten eingebauten Walzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la rectification in-situ des rouleaux d'une cage de laminage à chaud pour bandes

Publication

EP 0765697 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250188 A

Priority

DE 19537521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765697A1] The appts. incorporates several cup-shaped rotating grinding tools(1) which are distributed over the roll length. Together with their carriers they can oscillate parallel to the roll axis, and are pressure-adjustable perpendicular to this axis. Each tool is carried at the end of a grinding spindle installed in a sleeve (8) which is connected to the tool drive elements. The sleeve (8) is tubular and coaxially surrounds a driven grinding sleeve (6). The grinding sleeve accommodates the axially movable but rotationally keyed grinding spindle (3). The grinding spindle is connected to a drive (21) which serves for its limited axial displacement (4), and is carried by the sleeve (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 28/04; B24B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 28/04 (2006.01); B24B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/167 (2013.01); B21B 28/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0765697 A1 19970402; EP 0765697 B1 20000315; DE 19537521 A1 19970417; DE 19537521 C2 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050905

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2001-09-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010905

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000830

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604658 20000420

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT