Global Patent Index - EP 0765769 B1

EP 0765769 B1 2001-03-14 - Writing instrument, especially a fountain pen

Title (en)

Writing instrument, especially a fountain pen

Title (de)

Schreibgerät, insbesondere Füllhalter

Title (fr)

Instrument pour écrire, en particulier un stylographe

Publication

EP 0765769 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96117137 A

Priority

  • DE 4340760 A
  • DE 4340658 A
  • EP 94117637 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0655350A1] In a fountain pen, having a reservoir space (2) that can be filled with ink and is connected via a connecting duct (8) to a flow regulator (7) and a writing tip (6), and having a reserve space (3), which can be connected to the reservoir space (2) by opening a refill valve (4), which is closed in its position of rest, for the purposes of refilling, the reserve space (3) has a refill aperture which is accessible from outside and closed by an automatically closing valve, to which aperture a refill container, provided with means for holding the valve open, can be sealingly connected. The connecting duct (8) can be locked by a separating valve (9) which is open in its position of rest, and the refill valve (4) is connected to the separating valve (9) by an actuating element (12) in such a way that the separating valve (9) is closed before the refill valve (4) opens and is opened after the refill valve (4) has closed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43K 5/18; B43K 5/08; B43L 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B43K 5/08 (2006.01); B43K 5/18 (2006.01); B43K 11/00 (2006.01); B43L 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 5/08 (2013.01); B05B 11/0035 (2013.01); B43K 5/1863 (2013.01); B43K 11/00 (2013.01); B43L 25/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0655350 A1 19950531; EP 0655350 B1 19980128; EP 0765769 A2 19970402; EP 0765769 A3 19980121; EP 0765769 B1 20010314; ES 2113035 T3 19980416; ES 2155917 T3 20010601; JP 2680276 B2 19971119; JP H07251587 A 19951003; US 5888008 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071109

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061110

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061110

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061109

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061109

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PELIKAN GMBH TRANSFER- PELIKAN PBS-PRODUKTIONSGESE

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155917 T3

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409687 20010419

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 655350

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990208

1998-03-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980127

1998-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-04-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 655350

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI