Global Patent Index - EP 0765817 B1

EP 0765817 B1 2000-08-16 - Child resistant closure for sifting bottles or jars

Title (en)

Child resistant closure for sifting bottles or jars

Title (de)

Kindergesicherte Verschlussvorrichtung für Streu-Flaschen oder Gefässe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bouchage de sécurité pour flacons poudreurs ou pots

Publication

EP 0765817 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96450009 A

Priority

FR 9506401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2734545A1] The sealing of powder jars comprises a skirt (1) drilled with holes and a removable plug (9). Inside the skirt is a skirt upper part (4) and under its upper horizontal surface (8) is a groove (7) which receives the external sealing ring of the jar annular collar. The upper horizontal surface has a collar (3) projecting from the skirt in which is a notch (5). The notch is marked by a tongue (6) extending from the skirt. One or more of the holes (2) in the cape are sealed by a removable semi rigid rotating plug (9) having a horizontal surface (10). The periphery of this surface is extended by a vertical skirt whose internal lower part has three tenons (13,14). One tenon (13) is shorter than the other two tenons (14) to correspond with the length of the notch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 50/06; B65D 47/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/18 (2006.01); B65D 50/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 50/061 (2013.01); B65D 47/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2734545 A1 19961129; FR 2734545 B1 19970822; DE 69609792 D1 20000921; DE 69609792 T2 20010412; EP 0765817 A2 19970402; EP 0765817 A3 19971022; EP 0765817 B1 20000816; ES 2152006 T3 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. DES PLASTIQUES *BRENEZ S.A.

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050524

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. DES PLASTIQUES *BRENEZ S.A.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2004-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-06-30 [BERR] BE: REESTABLISHED

- Owner name: SOC. DES PLASTIQUES *BRENEZ S.A.

- Effective date: 20030624

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152006 T3

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609792 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990830

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980422

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB