Global Patent Index - EP 0765932 B1

EP 0765932 B1 2001-05-16 - Method of treating textile fabrics with foam

Title (en)

Method of treating textile fabrics with foam

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von Textilgeweben mit Schaum

Title (fr)

Procédé pour traiter des tissus textiles avec mousse

Publication

EP 0765932 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202619 A

Priority

EP 95202619 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765932A1] The invention concerns a foam for treating textile fabrics, the foam comprising a fabric softening clay. In a further aspect of the invention the foam may be dispensed from aerosol containers by means of a liquid or gaseous propellant. In this aspect of the invention a packaged product is provided comprising : (i) a foaming detergent composition comprising fabric softening clay; (ii) a propellant; and (iii) a container having a dispensing means, wherein the foaming detergent composition and the propellant are packaged inside the container. In a still further aspect of the invention a method of cleaning and conditioning textile fabrics is provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); D06M 11/79 (2006.01); D06M 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0094 (2013.01); C11D 1/02 (2013.01); C11D 3/1253 (2013.01); C11D 11/0058 (2013.01); C11D 17/0043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0765932 A1 19970402; EP 0765932 B1 20010516; AR 003726 A1 19980909; BR 9610673 A 19990706; CA 2233323 A1 19970403; DE 69520946 D1 20010621; DE 69520946 T2 20011220; ES 2156189 T3 20010616; JP 3916254 B2 20070516; JP H11512771 A 19991102; WO 9712024 A1 19970403

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090929

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080808

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080904

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080913

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2002-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520946 20010621

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156189 T3

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF TREATING TEXTILE FABRICS WITH FOAM

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF TREATING TEXTILE FABRICS WITH FOAM

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981014

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970909

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT