Global patent index - EP 0765959 B1

EP 0765959 B1 2000-01-19 - Filament nonwoven fabrics and method of fabricating the same

Title (en)

Filament nonwoven fabrics and method of fabricating the same

Title (de)

Vliesstoffe von Filamentfaden und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Etoffes non-tissée de filaments et sa méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 0765959 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96114791 A

Priority

  • JP 25167995 A
  • JP 25607995 A
  • JP 25608095 A
  • JP 25608395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765959A1] A filament nonwoven fabric and method of fabricating the same. The method comprises the steps of melting a polymer selected from the group consisting of poly(D-lactic acid), poly(L-lactic acid), copolymers of D-lactic acid and L-lactic acid, copolymers of D-lactic acid and hydroxy-carboxylic acid, and copolymers of L-lactic acid and hydroxy-carboxylic acid, said polymer having a melting point of 100 DEG C or more, or a blend of such polymers having a melting point of 100 DEG C or more, said polymer or polymer blend having a melt flow rate of from 10 to 100 g/10 minutes as measured at 190 DEG C. according to ASTM-D-1238 (E), in a temperature range of from (Tm + 20) DEG C to (Tm + 80) DEG C, where Tm DEG C is the melting point of the polymer or polymer blend; extruding the melt through a spinneret into filaments; drafting the extruded filaments by means of a suction device at a drafting speed of from 1,000 to 5,000 m/minute, thereby fining them down into finer filaments; depositing such filaments, as they are spread open each other, and are laid up on a travelling collector surface to form a web; and heat-treating the web thereby to obtain the nonwoven fabric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/42; D04H 1/54; D04H 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/48 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 3/00 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/14 (2013.01); D01D 5/30 (2013.01); D01F 6/625 (2013.01); D01F 6/84 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); D04H 1/4391 (2013.01); D04H 1/48 (2013.01); D04H 1/541 (2013.01); D04H 1/55 (2013.01); D04H 3/00 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0765959 A1 19970402; EP 0765959 B1 20000119; EP 0949371 A2 19991013; EP 0949371 A3 20040512; EP 0949371 B1 20081105; EP 1612314 A2 20060104; EP 1612314 A3 20061122; EP 1612314 B1 20090909; EP 1612314 B2 20140108; KR 100406244 B1 20040330

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-10 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2005-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-07-06 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-07-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20050412

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-09-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-09-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040906

- Year of fee payment: 09

2004-09-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040905

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC

2002-09-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC

- Effective date: 20001019

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-07-03 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL SE

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981013

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL SE