Global Patent Index - EP 0765985 B1

EP 0765985 B1 2000-05-31 - Constructional element

Title (en)

Constructional element

Title (de)

Bauelement

Title (fr)

Elément de construction

Publication

EP 0765985 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95202628 A

Priority

EP 95202628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0765985A1] The invention relates to a constructional element comprising a central hinging member (60,67,68,73-75) and a first and second connection plate (61,62,65,66,71,72), wherein the central member comprises at least a first arm (60,67) which is on each side hingingly connected to the connection plates, at least one of the connection plates comprising connection means (25,25') for attaching the at least one connection plate to a rigid body. A preferred embodiment of a constructional element comprises a central hollow member (2) and a first and second connection plate, wherein the central member comprises four arms (5-8), each arm having a base end (9,10) and a free end (15,16), a first and a second arm (5,6) being with their base ends (9) connected to the first connection plate (3) in a first lateral hinge point (21), a third and a fourth arm (7,8) being connected with their base ends (10) to the second connection plate in a second lateral hinge point (22), the free ends (15) of the first and third arm (5,7) being mutually connected in a first free hinge point (23), the free ends (16) of the second and fourth arm (6,8) being mutually connected in a second free hinge point (24), wherein at least one of the connection plates (3,4) comprises connection means (25,25',26,26';27,27') for attaching to a rigid body. The constructional element can be used as a door- or window frame and can connect window panes to a building at different orientations and can be adapted to different geometries. The constructional element can also be used to form constructions such as platforms, pyramids or geodesic domes. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 1/02 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0765985 A1 19970402; EP 0765985 B1 20000531; AT 193579 T 20000615; DE 69517321 D1 20000706; DE 69517321 T2 20001214; ES 2148426 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69517321

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100929

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100929

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DRAXLER, OLIVER

- Free text: DRAXLER, OLIVER#FAERBERSTRASSE 15#04105 LEIPZIG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DRAXLER, OLIVER#FAERBERSTRASSE 15#04105 LEIPZIG (DE)

2005-09-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-09-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050929

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-11-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2002-10-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148426 T3

2000-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517321 20000706

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193579 T 20000615

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980827

1997-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970929

1997-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL