Global Patent Index - EP 0766001 B1

EP 0766001 B1 2001-03-21 - Device to discharge a jet in a test stand of injection pumps

Title (en)

Device to discharge a jet in a test stand of injection pumps

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Strahlableitung in einem Einspritzpumpen-Prüfstand

Title (fr)

Dispositif de décharge du jet pour un banc d'essai pour pompes d'injection

Publication

EP 0766001 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96110703 A

Priority

DE 29515349 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ288298B6] In the present invention there is disclosed a device for diverting the flow a test room of injection pumps. A movable flow deflector (11) is pivotally arranged between the injection jet interceptor and an associated measurement vessel to divert the test oil coming from the interceptor, via at least one oil line, to the tank. The flow deflector (11) and the oil line to the tank form a closed system (27) for the test oil to be fed out. The flow deflector (11) has inlet holes (25) associated with the interceptor and lying under the interceptor in the pivoted in position. The oil line is connected to the flow deflector (11) and, at least in the connection region, is formed as a flexible hose (23). When removing hot test oil between measuring breaks, generation of oil vapors and aerosols is thus substantially reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29515349 U1 19970206; CZ 288298 B6 20010516; CZ 9602595 A3 19980415; EP 0766001 A2 19970402; EP 0766001 A3 19980204; EP 0766001 B1 20010321; ES 2155907 T3 20010601

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2005-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-06-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155907

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606617

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000524

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980804

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1997-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT